Darryl C. Towns facts for kids
Quick facts for kids
Darryl C. Towns
|
|
---|---|
Chair of the New York State Board of Parole | |
Assumed office January 1, 2023 |
|
Governor | Kathy Hochul |
Preceded by | Tina Stanford |
Commissioner of the New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal | |
In office April 28, 2011 – June 31, 2015 |
|
Governor | Andrew Cuomo |
Succeeded by | James Rubin |
Member of the New York State Assembly from the 54th district |
|
In office January 6, 1993 – February 10, 2011 |
|
Preceded by | Thomas F. Catapano |
Succeeded by | Rafael Espinal |
Personal details | |
Born | Brooklyn, New York, U.S. |
July 21, 1961
Political party | Democratic |
Parents |
|
Education | North Carolina Agricultural and Technical State University (BS) |
Darryl C. Towns (born July 21, 1961) was the Commissioner and CEO of New York State Homes and Community Renewal agency. He is a former representative of the 54th Assembly District in the New York State Legislature, which comprises the Brooklyn neighborhoods of Bushwick, Cypress Hills, and East New York from 1993 to 2011.
Career
Towns won the seat in the New York Assembly in September 1992, defeating 10-year incumbent Thomas Catapano.
In 1994 Towns was appointed Chairman of the Subcommittee on Mass Transit by Assembly Speaker Sheldon Silver.
From 1981 to 1986, Towns served in the United States Air Force.
Prior to his election to office, Towns also served as Director of Community Affairs at Interfaith Hospital.
In January 2007, Towns was elected chair of the State Legislature's Black, Puerto Rican, Hispanic & Asian Legislative Caucus.
In 2011, Towns vacated his Assembly seat to become Commissioner and CEO of the New York State Homes and Community Renewal agency when appointed by Governor Andrew Cuomo.
In 2022, Governor Kathy Hochul nominated and the New York State Senate voted yes on Daryll Towns to the Parole Board on June 6. On January 1, 2023, Governor Hochul appointed Towns as Chair of the Board.
Personal life
Towns is the son of former Congressman Edolphus Towns, who formerly represented the 11th and 10th Districts in Brooklyn's congressional delegation.
He is married to Karen Boykin-Towns, Senior Counselor at Sard Verbinnen & Co., a global strategic communications consultancy. They have two daughters.
He is a graduate of North Carolina Agricultural and Technical State University with a degree in economics.